Ask your own question, for FREE!
Mathematics
OpenStudy (anonymous):

what is the product of 2,000 and 58

OpenStudy (shadowfiend):

You can do this using long multiplication: 2000 x 58 ----- First you multiply 8 by the four numbers above in a row, then you shift over by one space and do the same for 5: 2000 x 58 ----- 0 (8 x 0) 2000 x 58 ----- 00 (8 x 0) 2000 x 58 ----- 000 (8 x 0) 2000 x 58 ----- 16000 (8 x 2) Then we do 5: 2000 x 58 ----- 16000 0 (5 x 0) 2000 x 58 ----- 16000 00 (5 x 0) 2000 x 58 ----- 16000 000 (5 x 0) 2000 x 58 ------ 16000 10000 (5 x 2) Then we can add these two together: 2000 x 58 --------- 16000 + 10000 --------- 116000 Make sense?

OpenStudy (anonymous):

YES THANKS !!!!

OpenStudy (shadowfiend):

Glad to help!

Can't find your answer? Make a FREE account and ask your own questions, OR help others and earn volunteer hours!

Join our real-time social learning platform and learn together with your friends!
Can't find your answer? Make a FREE account and ask your own questions, OR help others and earn volunteer hours!

Join our real-time social learning platform and learn together with your friends!